No. 23-713
Title:Joshua E. Bufkin, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:January 3, 2024
Linked with 23A340
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2022-1089)
   Decision Date:August 3, 2023
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 12 2023Application (23A339) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 7, 2023 to January 2, 2024, submitted to the The Chief Justice.
Oct 12 2023Application (23A340) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 1, 2023 to December 31, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 16 2023Application (23A339) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 2, 2024.
Oct 16 2023Application (23A340) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 31, 2023.
Dec 29 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2024 to March 4, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 24 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 4, 2024.
Feb 01 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2024Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2024Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Veterans Legal Services Program filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 27 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 4, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 29 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 18, 2024.
Mar 18 2024Brief of respondent Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 01 2024Reply of petitioners Joshua E. Bufkin, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 22 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 29 2024Petition GRANTED.
May 22 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 24 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 2, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 20, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
2100 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20037

MBOSTWICK@ORRICK.COM
202-339-8400
Party name: Joshua E. Bufkin, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Denis McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Brent Gorsuch Filbert
    Counsel of Record
Veterans Clinic, Univ of Missouri School of Law
119-120 Hulston Hall
Columbia, MO 65211

filbertb@missouri.edu
913-375-4539
Party name: National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium
Michael E. Joffre
    Counsel of Record
Sterne, Kessler, Goldstein & Fox, P.L.L.C.
1101 K Street, NW
10th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

mjoffre@sternekessler.com
202-772-8856
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy
Liam James Montgomery
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
680 Maine Avenue S.W.
Washington, DC 20024

lmontgomery@wc.com
2024345030
Party name: National Veterans Legal Services Program