No. 23-704
Title:Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Trade Commission, et al.
Docketed:December 29, 2023
Linked with 23A427
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-14161)
   Decision Date:August 29, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 08 2023Application (23A427) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 27, 2023 to January 26, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Application (23A427) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 27, 2023.
Dec 27 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 29, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 29, 2024 to February 28, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 24 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 28, 2024.
Feb 27 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 29 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 29, 2024.
Mar 21 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2024 to April 24, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 22 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 24, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Robert Foust Parsley
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Martin, PLLC
832 Georgia Avenue
Suite 1200
Chattanooga, TN 37402

Bob.Parsley@millermartin.com
4237858211
Party name: Hi-Tech Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Trade Commission