No. 23-687
Title:MRP Properties Company, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:December 27, 2023
Linked with 23A286
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1789)
   Decision Date:June 29, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:July 26, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2023Application (23A286) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 24, 2023 to December 22, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 02 2023Application (23A286) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 22, 2023.
Dec 22 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 26, 2024 to February 26, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2024.
Jan 26 2024Brief amici curiae of American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers and Western States Petroleum Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 26, 2024 to April 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 2, 2024.
Mar 29 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2024 to May 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 01 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including May 2, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Lehotsky Keller Cohn LLP
200 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20001

scott@lkcfirm.com
(512) 693-8350
Party name: MRP Properties Company, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Martha Sawyer Thomsen
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts L.L.P.
700 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

martha.thomsen@bakerbotts.com
2026397863
Party name: American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers and Western States Petroleum Association