No. 23-686
Title:Tiger Cela, Petitioner
v.
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General
Docketed:December 27, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1322)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:September 25, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 22 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2024)
Dec 22 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Jan 25 2024Waiver of right of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 31 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Feb 06 2024Response Requested. (Due March 7, 2024)
Feb 29 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2024 to April 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 01 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh St., NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

(202) 637-3386
Party name: Tiger Cela
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General