No. 23-6842
Title:Reginald Creshawn Doss, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 27, 2024
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3662)
   Decision Date:December 1, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 23 2024Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 28, 2024)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Mar 20 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 28, 2024 to April 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 21 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 29, 2024.
Apr 29 2024Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 15 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Heather Rae Quick
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender Office - Iowa
222 Third Avenue SE
Suite 290
Cedar Rapids, IA 52401

HEATHER_QUICK@FD.ORG
319-363-9540
Party name: Reginald Creshawn Doss
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States