No. 23-677 | |
Title: | Royal Canin U.S.A., Inc., et al., Petitioners v. Anastasia Wullschleger, et al. |
Docketed: | December 22, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-1796) |
Decision Date: | July 31, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 20, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 19 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 04 2024 | Waiver of right of respondents Anastasia Wullschleger, et al. to respond filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 10 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. |
Jan 17 2024 | Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2024) |
Jan 24 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Jan 26 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2024. |
Feb 16 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of The Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Mar 18 2024 | Brief of respondents Anastasia Wullschleger, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 01 2024 | Reply of petitioners Royal Canin U.S.A. Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 03 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. |
Apr 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Christopher M. Curran Counsel of Record | White & Case LLP 701 Thirteenth Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20005 ccurran@whitecase.com | 202 626 3643 |
Party name: Royal Canin U.S.A. Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Adam Ross Pulver Counsel of Record | Public Citizen Litigation Group 1600 20th St. NW Washington, DC 20009 APULVER@CITIZEN.ORG | 202-588-7790 |
Party name: Anastasia Wullschleger, et al. | ||
James Patrick Frickleton | Bartimus, Frickleton, Robertson, Rader, PC 4000 W. 114th St. Suite 310 Leawood, KS 66211 jimf@bflawfirm.com | 913-266-2300 |
Party name: Anastasia Wullschleger, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Claire Linda Leonard Counsel of Record | Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LPP 700 13th Street NW 10th Floor Washington, DC 20005 claire.leonard@freshfields.com | 202-777-4764 |
Party name: The Missouri Chamber of Commerce and Industry |