No. 23-6753 | |
Title: | Michael Avenatti, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | February 14, 2024 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1778, 22-351) |
Decision Date: | August 30, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 13, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 12 2024 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 15, 2024) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Mar 06 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2024 to April 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Mar 07 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2024. |
Apr 15 2024 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 30 2024 | Reply of petitioner Michael Avenatti filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
May 01 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024. |
May 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2024. |
May 28 2024 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Daniel George Habib Counsel of Record | Federal Defenders of New York, Inc. 52 Duane Street, 10th Floor New York, NY 10007 daniel_habib@fd.org | 212-417-8742 |
Party name: Michael Avenatti | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |