No. 23-668 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Warren King, Petitioner
v.
Shawn Emmons, Warden
Docketed:December 20, 2023
Linked with 23A412
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-12804)
   Decision Date:June 2, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:August 18, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2023Application (23A412) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 16, 2023 to January 15, 2024, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main Document
Nov 08 2023Application (23A412) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 18, 2023.
Dec 18 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2024)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Brief amici curiae of Marilyn Garrett, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 18 2024Brief of respondent Shawn Emmons, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 19 2024Brief amicus curiae of Georgia Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 06 2024Reply of petitioner Warren King filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024.
Feb 20 2024Record Requested.
Feb 27 2024Electronic record received from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Mar 11 2024Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of Georgia (1 envelope).
Mar 12 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024.
Mar 26 2024Rescheduled.
Apr 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.
Apr 10 2024Rescheduled.
Apr 15 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 16 2024Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MHELLMAN@JENNER.COM
202-639-6000
Party name: Warren King
Attorneys for Respondent
Sabrina D. Graham
    Counsel of Record
Senior Assistant Attorney General
40 Capitol Sq., SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

sgraham@law.ga.gov
404-458-3239
Party name: Shawn Emmons
Other
Katherine Lorhea Moss
    Counsel of Record
Southern Center for Human Rights
60 Walton Street, NW
Atlanta, GA 30303

kmoss@schr.org
3104330887
Party name: Marilyn Garrett and Eddie Hood
William James Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
100 East Pratt St., Ste. 2440
Baltimore, MD 21202

wmurphy@zuckerman.com
(410) 949-1146
Party name: Georgia Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers