No. 23-657 | |
Title: | Michelle MacDonald, Petitioner v. Minnesota Office of Lawyers Professional Responsibility |
Docketed: | December 18, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Minnesota |
Case Numbers: | (A21-1636) |
Decision Date: | September 15, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 13 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 17, 2024) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 10 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent Minnesota Office of Lawyers Professional Responsibility to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 17 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. |
Feb 20 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Michelle Lowney MacDonald Shimota Counsel of Record | MacDonald Law Firm, LLC 1069 South Robert Street West St. Paul, MN 55118 Michelle@MacDonaldLawFirm.com | 651-222-4400 |
Party name: Michelle MacDonald | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth Catherine Kramer Counsel of Record | Office of the Minnesota Attorney General 445 Minnesota Street Suite 1100 Saint Paul, MN 55101 LIZ.KRAMER@AG.STATE.MN.US | 6517571010 |
Party name: Minnesota Office of Lawyers Professional Responsibility |