No. 23-649
Title:Lisa Price, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Nickie Miller, Petitioner
v.
Montgomery County, Kentucky, et al.
Docketed:December 15, 2023
Linked with 23A404
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-6076)
   Decision Date:July 5, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:August 15, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2023Application (23A404) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 13, 2023 to December 13, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 06 2023Application (23A404) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until December 13, 2023.
Dec 13 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2024)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2023Motion of Keith Craycraft to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2024 to February 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 15, 2024, for all respondents.
Feb 15 2024Brief of respondent Keith Craycraft in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2024Reply of petitioner Lisa Price, Personal Representative of the Estate of Nickie Miller filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 06 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024.
Mar 19 2024Rescheduled.
Mar 25 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024.
Mar 25 2024Rescheduled.
Apr 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.
Apr 09 2024Rescheduled.
Apr 15 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 16 2024Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

JROSENKRANZ@ORRICK.COM
212-506-5380
Party name: Lisa Price, Personal Representative of the Estate of Nickie Miller
Debra LoevyLoevy and Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen, 3rd Floor
Chicago, IL 60607

debra@loevy.com
3122435900
Party name: Lisa Price, Personal Representative of the Estate of Nickie Miller
Elliot Robert SlosarLoevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen, 3rd FL
Chicago, IL 60607

elliot@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: Lisa Price, Personal Representative of the Estate of Nickie Miller
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew Franklin Kuhn
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General of Kentucky
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

MATT.KUHN@KY.GOV
(502) 696-5300
Party name: Keith Craycraft