No. 23-6302 | |
Title: | Robert Lee Crawford, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | December 19, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-36020) |
Decision Date: | May 15, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 26, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 18 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 18, 2024) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix | |
Jan 02 2024 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 04 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024. |
Jan 22 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Robert Lee Crawford Counsel of Record | Reg. No. 17524-046 Federal Prison Camp Duluth P.O. Box 1000 Duluth, MN 55814 | |
Party name: Robert L. Crawford | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |