No. 23-628 | |
Title: | Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, Petitioner v. Azucena Aracely Lazo-Gavidia, et al. |
Docketed: | December 11, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (20-2306) |
Decision Date: | July 12, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 8, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 07 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2024) |
Dec 07 2023 | Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system. |
Jan 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. |
Jan 29 2024 | Response Requested. (Due February 28, 2024) |
Feb 28 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2024 to March 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Mar 01 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 29, 2024. |
Mar 22 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 29, 2024 to April 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Mar 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 29, 2024. |
Apr 29 2024 | Brief of respondents Azucena Aracely Lazo-Gavidia, et al. filed. |
May 14 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024. |
Jun 17 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024. |
Jun 24 2024 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Campos-Chaves v. Garland, 602 U. S. ___ (2024). |
Jul 26 2024 | Judgment Issued. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Merrick B. Garland | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Mary Lynn Anna Tedesco Counsel of Record | Tedesco Legal, PC 1515 Mockingbird Lane, 4th Floor, Ste 4125 Charlotte, NC 28209 marylynn@tedescoimmigration.com | 9809991253 |
Party name: Azucena Aracely Lazo-Gavidia, et al. |