No. 23-622 | |
Title: | Dale Thrush, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | December 8, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-1588) |
Decision Date: | July 17, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 7, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 06 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 14 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024. |
Jan 08 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Venar Raad Ayar Counsel of Record | Ayar Law 30095 Northwestern Hwy, Ste. 102 Farmington Hills, MI 48334 venar@ayarlaw.com | 248-262-3400 |
Party name: Dale Thrush | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |