No. 23-621 | |
Title: | Gerald F. Lackey, in His Official Capacity as the Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles, Petitioner v. Damian Stinnie, et al. |
Docketed: | December 8, 2023 |
Linked with 23A390 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1756) |
Decision Date: | August 7, 2023 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 27 2023 | Application (23A390) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 5, 2023 to November 20, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Nov 01 2023 | Application (23A390) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 20, 2023. |
Nov 20 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2024) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 05 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Georgia, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Jan 24 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. |
Jan 29 2024 | Response Requested. (Due February 28, 2024) |
Feb 28 2024 | Brief of respondents Damian Stinnie, et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 19 2024 | Reply of petitioner Gerald F. Lackey, in his Official Capacity as the Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 20 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. |
Apr 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. |
Apr 22 2024 | Petition GRANTED. |
Apr 24 2024 | Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed. |
Main Document | |
Apr 29 2024 | Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including June 20, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 5, 2024. |
Jun 20 2024 | Brief of petitioner Gerald F. Lackey, in his Official Capacity as the Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 20 2024 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 27 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 27 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Local Government Legal Center, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 27 2024 | Brief amici curiae of Georgia, et al. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jun 27 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of University of Florida Board of Trustees filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jul 08 2024 | Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jul 26 2024 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, October 8, 2024. |
Jul 26 2024 | Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Erika Lauren Maley Counsel of Record | Virginia Office of the Attorney General 202 North 9th Street Richmond, VA 23219 emaley@oag.state.va.us | 804-786-2071 |
Party name: Gerald F. Lackey, in his Official Capacity as the Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald Counsel of Record | McGuireWoods LLP Gateway Plaza 800 East Canal Street Richmond, VA 23219 MFITZGERALD@MCGUIREWOODS.COM | 804-775-4716 |
Party name: Damian Stinnie, et al. | ||
Jonathan T. Blank | McGuireWoods LLP 323 Second Street SE, Suite 700 Charlottesville, VA 22902 jblank@mcguirewoods.com | 434-977-2509 |
Party name: Damian Stinnie, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Stephen John Petrany Counsel of Record | Georgia Department of Law, Solicitor General 40 Capitol Square SW Atlanta, GA 30334 SPETRANY@LAW.GA.GOV | 404-458-3546 |
Party name: Georgia, et al. | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Joshua Alan Skinner Counsel of Record | City of Arlington City Attorney's Office P.O. Box 90231 MS63-0300 Arlington, TX 76004 joshua.skinner@arlingtontx.gov | 8174596878 |
Party name: LOCAL GOVERNMENT LEGAL CENTER, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COUNTIES, NATIONAL LEAGUE OF CITIES, INTERNATIONAL MUNICIPAL LAWYERS ASSOCIATION, GOVERNMENT FINANCE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION, AND THE CITY OF ARLINGTON | ||
H. Christopher Bartolomucci Counsel of Record | Schaerr | Jaffe LLP 1717 K Street NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20006 CBARTOLOMUCCI@SCHAERR-JAFFE.COM | 202-787-1060 |
Party name: University of Florida Board of Trustees |