No. 23-6038 | |
Title: | Lakeith Lynn Washington, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | November 17, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-10574) |
Decision Date: | August 16, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 14 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 18, 2023) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Dec 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2023 to January 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 13 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2024. |
Jan 17 2024 | Memorandum of respondent United States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 01 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024. |
Jun 28 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 7/1/2024. |
Jul 02 2024 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Erlinger v. United States, 602 U. S. ___ (2024). |
Aug 05 2024 | Judgment Issued. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Adam Ryan Nicholson Counsel of Record | Office of the Federal Public Defender 525 South Griffin Street, Suite 629 Dallas, TX 75202 ADAM_NICHOLSON@FD.ORG | 214-767-2746 |
Party name: Lakeith Washington | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States |