No. 23-583
Title:Amina Bouarfa, Petitioner
v.
Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al.
Docketed:November 30, 2023
Linked with 23A348
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-12429)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2023Application (23A348) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 26, 2023 to December 11, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Oct 18 2023Application (23A348) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until November 27, 2023.
Nov 27 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 2, 2024)
Petition
Nov 27 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Dec 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2024 to February 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Dec 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 1, 2024.
Jan 02 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges filed.
Main Document
Jan 22 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2024 to February 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Jan 23 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 29, 2024.
Feb 29 2024Brief of respondent Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary of Homeland Security, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Mar 19 2024Reply of petitioner Amina Bouarfa filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.
Apr 15 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 22 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 29 2024Petition GRANTED.
Apr 29 2024As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
May 07 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 3, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 22, 2024.
Jul 03 2024Brief of petitioner Amina Bouarfa filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 03 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 10 2024Brief amici curiae of Administrative and Immigration Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2024Brief amici curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2024Amicus brief of The American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of Florida submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2024Amicus brief of American Immigrant Investor Alliance, American Lending Center Holdings and Century American Regional Center submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 10 2024Amicus brief of Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, National Immigration Litigation Alliance, American Immigration Council submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Samir Ibrahim Deger-Sen
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

SAMIR.DEGER-SEN@LW.COM
2129064619
Party name: Amina Bouarfa
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Mayorkas, Alejandro
Other
Matthew Hyrum Adams
    Counsel of Record
Northwest Immigrant Rights Project
615 Second Avenue
Suite 400
Seattle, WA 98104

matt@nwirp.org
206-957-8611
Party name: Northwest Immigrant Rights Project, National Immigration Litigation Alliance, American Immigration Council
Victoria Dorfman
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

VDORFMAN@JONESDAY.COM
2028793687
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center, Asista Immigration Assistance, Oxfam America, National Immigrant Women’s Advocacy Project, Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence and National Network to End Domestic Violence
Ira Jay Kurzban
    Counsel of Record
Kurzban Kurzban Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
131 Madeira Avenue
Coral Gables, FL 33134

ira@kktplaw.com
3054440060
Party name: American Immigrant Investor Alliance, American Lending Center Holdings and Century American Regional Center
Richard W. Mark
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

RMark@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-4000
Party name: Former Executive Office for Immigration Review Judges
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3000
Party name: Administrative and Immigration Law Professors
Cody Hirt Wofsy
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
39 Drumm St.
San Francisco, CA 94111

cwofsy@aclu.org
415-343-0785
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union and the ACLU of Florida