No. 23-578
Title:Christopher Kinzy, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 29, 2023
Linked with 23A338
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-30169)
   Decision Date:July 26, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 11 2023Application (23A338) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 24, 2023 to December 22, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 16 2023Application (23A338) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 27, 2023.
Nov 13 2023Application (23A338) to extend further the time from November 27, 2023 to December 22, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Written RequestProof of Service
Nov 16 2023Application (23A338) denied by Justice Alito.
Nov 27 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 29, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 14 2023Response Requested. (Due January 16, 2024)
Jan 09 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2024 to February 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 11 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 15, 2024.
Feb 06 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 15, 2024 to March 15, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 15, 2024.
Mar 07 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 15, 2024 to April 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 12, 2024.
Apr 12 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20005

SHAY.DVORETZKY@SKADDEN.COM
202-371-7370
Party name: Christopher Kinzy
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States