No. 23-571
Vide 23-436
Title:Madeleine Pickens, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 28, 2023
Linked with 23A311
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55197)
   Decision Date:May 17, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:July 25, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2023Application (23A311) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 23, 2023 to November 22, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Oct 10 2023Application (23A311) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 22, 2023.
Nov 22 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2023 to January 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 29, 2024.
Jan 29 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 13 2024Reply of petitioner Madeleine Pickens filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

NEAL.KATYAL@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
202 637 5528
Party name: Madeleine Pickens
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#700
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation