No. 23-568
Title:Robert Bartlett, et al., Petitioners
v.
Muhammad Baasiri, et al.
Docketed:November 28, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-2019)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 28 2023Brief amicus curiae of Professor William S. Dodge filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2023Brief amici curiae of Jewish Organizations and Allies filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2023Brief amicus curiae of Investor Choice Advocates Network filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2023Brief amici curiae of Former National Security Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 17 2024Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2024)
Jan 25 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2024 to April 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2024, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Jacob Radine
    Counsel of Record
Osen LLC
190 Moore Street, Suite 272
Hackensack, NJ 07601

MRADINE@OSENLAW.COM
(201) 265-6400
Party name: Robert Bartlett, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Mark Wendell DeLaquil
    Counsel of Record
Baker Hostetler
1050 Connecticut Avenue NW, Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

mdelaquil@bakerlaw.com
2028611527
Party name: Muhammad Baasiri, et al.
Other
Andrew Laurence Fish
    Counsel of Record
Duane Morris LLP
230 Park Avenue
Suite 1130
New York, NY 10169

alfish@duanemorris.com
2124048761
Party name: Former National Security Officials
Douglass A. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

dmitchell@jenner.com
(202) 639-6000
Party name: Professor William S. Dodge
Hal R. Morris
    Counsel of Record
Saul Ewing LLP
161 North Clark Street
Suite 4200
Chicago, IL 60601

HAL.MORRIS@SAUL.COM
(312) 876-7100
Party name: American Association of Jewish Lawyers and Jurists
Mark Trachtenberg
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
1221 McKinney St.
Suite 4000
Houston, TX 77010

mark.trachtenberg@haynesboone.com
7135472528
Party name: Jewish Organizations and Allies
Avi Weitzman
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

aviweitzman@paulhastings.com
2123186920
Party name: Investor Choice Advocates Network