No. 23-5618 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Gustavo Tijerina Sandoval, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:September 20, 2023
Linked with 23A80
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(AP-77,081)
   Decision Date:December 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 17, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 25 2023Application (23A80) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2023 to September 14, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 31 2023Application (23A80) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 14, 2023.
Sep 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 20, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 20, 2023 to November 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 16 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 20, 2023.
Nov 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 20, 2023 to January 4, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 4, 2024.
Jan 04 2024Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 16 2024Reply of petitioner Gustavo Tijerina Sandoval filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 18 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Feb 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024.
Feb 26 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024.
Mar 11 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024.
Mar 18 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024.
Mar 19 2024Record Requested.
Mar 25 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024.
Apr 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024.
Apr 12 2024Electronic record from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas received.
Apr 15 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jennae Rose Swiergula
    Counsel of Record
Texas Defender Service
9390 Research Boulevard
Kaleido II, Suite 210
Austin, TX 78759

jswiergula@texasdefender.org
(512) 320-8300
Party name: Gustavo Tijerina Sandoval
Attorneys for Respondent
Jefferson David Clendenin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Texas
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

jay.clendenin@oag.texas.gov
5129361400
Party name: Texas