No. 23-5572
Title:Joseph W. Fischer, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 13, 2023
Linked with 23A136
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3038)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:May 23, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2023Application (23A136) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 21, 2023 to October 5, 2023, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentOther
Aug 15 2023Application (23A136) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 5, 2023.
Sep 11 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 13, 2023)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 13, 2023 to November 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 13, 2023.
Oct 13 2023Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 30 2023Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Reply of petitioner Joseph Fischer filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 13 2023Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Jan 29 2024Brief of petitioner Joseph Fischer filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of FormerFedsGroup Freedom Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2024Brief amicus curiae of LONANG Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Brief amici curiae of Law-Linguistics Research Team Clark D. Cunningham and Ute Romer-Barron in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Brief amici curiae of U.S. Senator Tom Cotton, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Counsel Action, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Brief amici curiae of America's Future, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Concerned for the Constitutional Rights of Defendants filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Brief amici curiae of Christopher Warnagiris, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Feb 16 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 16, 2024.
Feb 21 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit.
Feb 21 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 28 2024Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frederick William Ulrich
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defenders Office
100 Chestnut Street
3rd Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

FRITZ_ULRICH@FD.ORG
717-782-2237
Party name: Joseph Fischer
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Paloma Appolonia Capanna
    Counsel of Record
Paloma A. Capanna
106-B Professional Drive
Beaufort, NC 28516

pcapanna@yahoo.com
315 584 2929
Party name: Citizens Concerned for the Constitutional Rights of Defendants
Theodore Mark Cooperstein
    Counsel of Record
Clouthier Cooperstein PLLC
1020 Highland Colony Parkway
Suite 803
RIDGELAND, MS 39157

ted@msappellatelawyers.com
6013972471
Party name: Christopher Warnagiris, Christopher Carnell, and Robert Norwood
Clark Douglas Cunningham
    Counsel of Record
Georgia State University College of Law
85 Park Place NE
Atlanta, GA 30303

cdcunningham@gsu.edu
(404) 413-9168
Party name: Law-Linguistics Research Team Clark D. Cunningham and Ute Romer-Barron
R. Trent McCotter
    Counsel of Record
Boyden Gray PLLC
801 17th Street, N.W.
Suite 350
Washington, DC 20006

tmccotter@boydengray.com
202-706-5488
Party name: U.S. Senator Tom Cotton, Representative Jim Jordan, and 21 Other Members of Congress
Kerry Lee Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Pentiuk, Couvreur, & Kobiljak, P.C.
2915 Biddle Avenue
Suite 200
Wyandotte, MI 48192

kmorgan@pck-law.com
7342817100
Party name: Lonang Institute
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

WJO@MINDSPRING.COM
7033565070
Party name: America's Future, Gun Owners of America, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of California, Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, The Presidential Coalition, Tennessee Firearms Association, U.S. Constitutional Rights Legal Defense Fund, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
(202) 546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
109 Second St., NE
Washington, DC 20002

COURT@LC.ORG
(202) 289-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel Action, Inc.
Edward Lacy Tarpley Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Edward L. Tarpley, Jr. APLC
819 Johnston Street
Alexandria, LA 71301

ed@edtarpley.com
318-487-1460
Party name: FormerFedsGroup Freedom Foundation and Members, et al