No. 23-541
Title:Michael Donnellon, Deputy, et al., Petitioners
v.
John Jordan
Docketed:November 20, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-1154)
   Decision Date:July 18, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:August 17, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024.
Jan 08 2024Response Requested. (Due February 7, 2024)
Jan 30 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2024 to March 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael Alex Sink
    Counsel of Record
Adams County Attorney's Office
4430 S. Adams County Parkway
Suite C5000B
Brighton, CO 80601

msink@adcogov.org
7205236307
Party name: Deputy Michael Donnellon, et al.
Kerri Ann BoothAdams County Attorney's Office
4430 South Adams County Parkway, Suite C5000B
Brighton, CO 80601

kbooth@adcogov.org
7205236881
Party name: Deputy Michael Donnellon, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert M. Liechty
    Counsel of Record
Robert M. Liechty PC
1800 Gaylord Street
Denver, CO 80206

rliechty@crossliechty.com
303-861-5300
Party name: John Jordan