No. 23-536 | |
Title: | Kendall Merlo, Petitioner v. Ingrid Warren, Presiding Judge, Probate Court No. 2, Dallas County, Texas |
Docketed: | November 20, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Texas |
Case Numbers: | (22-0797) |
Decision Date: | August 18, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 16 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 20 2023 | Waiver of right of respondents Appointed Guardian ad Litem, Don D. Ford III to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jan 03 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024. |
Jan 22 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Charles W. McGarry Counsel of Record | Law Office of Charles McGarry 13601 Preston Rd. Suite220E DALLAS, TX 75240 cmcgarry@ix.netcom.com | 2147480800 |
Party name: Kendall Merlo | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Don D. Ford III Counsel of Record | Ford + Bergner LLP 901 Main Street, 33rd Floor Dallas, TX 75202 dford@fordbergner.com | 214-389-0887 |
Party name: Appointed Guardian ad Litem, Don D. Ford III | ||
Kenneth E. Walker | Walker & Chambers P.O. Box 764379 Dallas, TX 75376-4379 kw@walkerchambers.com | 214-339-1490 |
Party name: Independent Executor Mark A. Merlo |