No. 23-5130 | |
Title: | Caleb Bryant Hickcox, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | July 19, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-50365) |
Decision Date: | April 25, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 14 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 18, 2023) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service | |
Jul 28 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent United States of America to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Aug 03 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023. |
Oct 02 2023 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Chad Phillip Van Cleave Counsel of Record | Van Cleave Law Firm, PC P.O. Box 1703 Georgetown, TX 78627 CHAD@DRUGANDGUNLAWYER.COM | 5124970604 |
Party name: Caleb Hickcox | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |