No. 23-51
Title:Neal Bissonnette, et al., Petitioners
v.
LePage Bakeries Park St., LLC, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2023
Linked with 22A984
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1681)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:February 15, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2023Application (22A984) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2023 to June 15, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 11 2023Application (22A984) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until June 15, 2023.
Jun 02 2023Application (22A984) to extend further the time from June 15, 2023 to July 15, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jun 08 2023Application (22A984) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until July 17, 2023.
Jul 17 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2023Brief of respondents LePage Bakeries Park St., LLC, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 05 2023Reply of petitioners Neal Bissonnette, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Sep 29 2023Petition GRANTED.
Nov 13 2023Brief of petitioners Neal Bissonnette, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 15 2023Brief amici curiae of National Employment Law Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Public Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Academy of Arbitrators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Illinois, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 13 2023Brief of respondents LePage Bakeries Park St., LLC, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Independent Bakers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of Professors Samuel Estreicher, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of The California Employment Law Council filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Amazon.com, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amici curiae of DRI Center for Law and Public Policy, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Restaurant Law Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, February 20, 2024.
Jan 05 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit.
Jan 09 2024Record received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit and available with the Clerk.
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED.
Jan 12 2024Reply of petitioners Neal Bissonnette, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2024Record received from the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 20 2024Argued. For petitioners: Jennifer D. Bennett, San Francisco, Cal. For respondents: Traci L. Lovitt, New York, N. Y.
Apr 12 2024Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jennifer Dale Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler LLP
505 Montgomery St.
Suite 625
San Francisco, CA 94111

JENNIFER@GUPTAWESSLER.COM
(415) 573-0336
Party name: Neal Bissonnette, et al.
Harold Louis LichtenLichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston- Street, Suite. 2000
Boston, MA 02116

hlichten@llrlaw.com
617-994-5800
Party name: Neal Bissonnette, et al.
Zachary Levy RubinLichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston St. Suite 2000
Boston, MA 02116

zrubin@llrlaw.com
617-994-5800
Party name: Neal Bissonnette, et al.
Matthew William ThomsonLichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
729 Boylston St. Suite 2000
Boston, MA 02116

mthomson@llrlaw.com
617-994-5800
Party name: Neal Bissonnette, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Traci L. Lovitt
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281-1047

tlovitt@jonesday.com
(212) 326-7830
Party name: LePage Bakeries Park St., LLC, et al.
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

CANDREWS@WLF.ORG
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Brian Taylor Goldman
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP
425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

BGOLDMAN@HSGLLP.COM
646-837-5129
Party name: Professors Samuel Estreicher and David Sherwyn
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Thomas G. Hungar
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

THUNGAR@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Independent Bakers Association
Chris Ashod Jalian
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
515 South Flower Street, 25th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

chrisjalian@paulhastings.com
2136836000
Party name: The California Employment Law Council
Michael Edward Kenneally Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

MICHAEL.KENNEALLY@MORGANLEWIS.COM
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Amazon.com, Inc.
Leah Marie Nicholls
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L Street, N.W.
Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

LNicholls@publicjustice.net
2027978600
Party name: Public Justice
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

JANE.NOTZ@ILAG.GOV
312-814-5376
Party name: Illinois et al.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Retail Federation, and American Bakers Association
Catherine Kiley Ruckelshaus
    Counsel of Record
National Employment Law Projec
90 Broad Street
Suite 1100
New York, NY 10004

cruckelshaus@nelp.org
6466938221
Party name: National Employment Law Project and National Employment Lawyers Association
Todd Brian Scherwin
    Counsel of Record
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
444 S. Flower St, Ste 1590
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tscherwin@fisherphillips.com
2133304450
Party name: Restaurant Law Center
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
Suite 550
14800 Quorum Drive
Dallas, TX 75240

gerson@texasinjurylaw.com
9722435297
Party name: American Association for Justice
Sarah Elizabeth Spencer
    Counsel of Record
Spencer Willson PLLC
66 E. Exchange Place
Suite 208
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sarah@spencerwillsonpllc.com
8013468120
Party name: DRI Center for Law and Public Policy
Barry Marc Winograd
    Counsel of Record
Arbitrator & Mediator
875-A Island Dr., No. 144
Alameda, CA 94502

winmedarb@aol.com
5103937283
Party name: National Academy of Arbitrators