No. 23-506
Title:Occidental Exploration and Production Company, Petitioner
v.
Andes Petroleum Ecuador Limited
Docketed:November 14, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3039)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:August 11, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 09 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 14, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 21 2023Waiver of right of respondent Andes Petroleum Ecuador Limited to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 04 2023Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2024)
Dec 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2024 to February 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 2, 2024.
Feb 02 2024Brief of respondent Andes Petroleum Ecuador Limited in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024.
Feb 23 2024Joint motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari. (Distributed)
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Clement & Murphy, PLLC
706 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314

PAUL.CLEMENT@CLEMENTMURPHY.COM
(202) 742-8900
Party name: Occidental Exploration and Production Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Sonny Balber
    Counsel of Record
Herbert Smith Freehills New York LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

SCOTT.BALBER@HSF.COM
9175427600
Party name: Andes Petroleum Ecuador Limited