No. 23-50
Title:Jascha Chiaverini, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Napoleon, Ohio, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2023
Linked with 22A935
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-3996)
   Decision Date:January 11, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:February 15, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 21 2023Application (22A935) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 16, 2023 to July 14, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of ServiceOther
Apr 26 2023Application (22A935) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until July 14, 2023.
Jul 14 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2023)
PetitionOtherAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2023Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 21, 2023 to September 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 20, 2023.
Sep 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 20, 2023 to October 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 20, 2023.
Oct 20 2023Brief of respondents Napoleon, OH, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Nov 08 2023Reply of petitioners Jascha Chiaverini, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 13 2023Petition GRANTED.
Jan 04 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 31, 2024. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including March 5, 2024.
Jan 31 2024Brief of petitioners Jascha Chiaverini, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Police Accountability Project filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 15, 2024.
Feb 16 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit.
Feb 21 2024Record received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit and available with the Clerk.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Easha Anand
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

EANAND@STANFORD.EDU
(650) 724-3345
Party name: Jascha Chiaverini, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Megan Marie Wold
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mwold@cooperkirk.com
2028795000
Party name: Napoleon, OH, et al.
Other
Marie Leora Miller
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
3200 N Central Ave.
Suite 2160
Phoenix, AZ 85012

mmiller@ij.org
951-816-0455
Party name: Institute for Justice
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Steven Edwards Art
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen St., 3rd Fl.
Chicago, IL 60607

steve@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: The Cato Institute
Anna Aleksandrovna BidwellInstitute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Rd.
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

ABIDWELL@IJ.ORG
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

BRIANNE@THEUSCONSTITUTION.ORG
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Patrick Michael JaicomoInstitute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

PJAICOMO@IJ.ORG
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: National Police Accountability Project
Zachary D. Tripp
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
2001 M Street NW
Washington, DC 20036

ZACK.TRIPP@WEIL.COM
(202) 682-7000
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers