No. 23-492
Vide 23-466, 23-477
Title:Jane Doe 1, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kentucky, ex rel. Russell Coleman, Attorney General of Kentucky
Docketed:November 9, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5609)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 11, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 11, 2023 to January 10, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2024.
Nov 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Foreign Non-Profit Organizations Advocating for the Rights of Transgender People filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2023Brief amici curiae of Elliot Page, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2023Brief amicus curiae of TransParent filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 11 2023Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Pediatrics and Additional National and State Medical and Mental Health Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 11 2023Stipulation to dismiss the petition under Rule 46.1 as to petitioners John Doe 3, Jane Doe 3, and Jane Minor Doe 3 only filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2024 to February 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 14 2023Petition for writ of certiorari dismissed under Rule 46 only as to petitioners John Doe 3, Jane Doe 3, and Jane Minor Doe 3.
Dec 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 5, 2024.
Feb 02 2024Brief amicus curiae of Alabama filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2024Brief of respondent Kentucky in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2024Reply of petitioners Jane Doe 1, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUNIKOWSKY@JENNER.COM
202-639-600
Party name: Jane Doe 1, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Franklin Kuhn
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General of Kentucky
700 Capital Avenue, Suite 118
Frankfort, KY 40601

MATT.KUHN@KY.GOV
(502) 696-5300
Party name: Kentucky
Other
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen and Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

cboccuzzi@cgsh.com
212-225-2508
Party name: Elliot Page, et al.
Benjamin Bradshaw
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

bbradshaw@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: TransParent
Andrew Rhys Davies
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

andrew.davies@wilmerhale.com
212 610 6300
Party name: Foreign Non-Profit Organizations Advocating for the Rights of Transgender People
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV
334-242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama
Debra Jean Veta
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

jveta@cov.com
202 662-5294
Party name: American Academy of Pediatrics and Additional National and State Medical and Mental Health Organizations