No. 23-488
Title:Bruce R. Sands, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Patricia V. Bradley, Warden
Docketed:November 8, 2023
Linked with 23A182
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55759)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2023Application (23A182) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 6, 2023 to November 5, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Aug 29 2023Application (23A182) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 5, 2023.
Nov 06 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 8, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 8, 2023 to January 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 8, 2024.
Dec 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 8, 2024 to March 8, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 8, 2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Fred Anthony Rowley Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
953 E. Third Street
Los Angeles, CA 90013

FRED.ROWLEY@WSGR.COM
2136839100
Party name: Bruce Sands, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States