No. 23-477 Vide 23-466, 23-492 | |
Title: | United States, Petitioner v. Jonathan Skrmetti, Attorney General and Reporter for Tennessee, et al. |
Docketed: | November 6, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-5600) |
Decision Date: | September 28, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 06 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 6, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixProof of Service | |
Nov 08 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2023 to January 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Nov 09 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 5, 2024. |
Nov 17 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Foreign Non-Profit Organizations Advocating for the Rights of Transgender People filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 04 2023 | Brief amici curiae of Elliot Page, et al. filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 08 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2024 to February 5, 2024, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Dec 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 5, 2024. |
Feb 02 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of Alabama filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 02 2024 | Brief of respondents Jonathan Skrmetti, Attorney General and Reporter for Tennessee, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 20 2024 | Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 21 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024. |
Mar 13 2024 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 18 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2024. |
Mar 20 2024 | Rescheduled. |
Mar 25 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/28/2024. |
Mar 26 2024 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 08 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2024. |
Apr 11 2024 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 15 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024. |
Apr 18 2024 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 22 2024 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024. |
Apr 25 2024 | Rescheduled. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Cameron Thomas Norris Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700 Arlington, VA 22209 cam@consovoymccarthy.com | 7032439423 |
Party name: Jonathan Thomas Skrmetti, et al. | ||
Steven James Griffin | Tennessee Attorney General's Office P.O. Box 20207 Nashville, TN 37202 steven.griffin@ag.tn.gov | 6157419598 |
Party name: Jonathan Thomas Skrmetti, et al. | ||
Jeffrey Matthew Harris | Consovoy McCarthy PLLC 1600 Wilson Blvd. Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22209 JEFF@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM | (703) 243-9423 |
Party name: Jonathan Thomas Skrmetti, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Andrew Rhys Davies Counsel of Record | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP 7 World Trade Center 250 Greenwich Street New York, NY 10007 andrew.davies@wilmerhale.com | 212 230 8800 |
Party name: Foreign Non-Profit Organizations Advocating for the Rights of Transgender People | ||
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr. Counsel of Record | Cleary Gottlieb Steen and Hamilton LLP One Liberty Plaza New York, NY 10006 cboccuzzi@cgsh.com | 212-225-2508 |
Party name: Elliot Page, et al. | ||
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr. Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 501 Washington Ave Montgomery, AL 36130 EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV | 334-242-7300 |
Party name: State of Alabama |