No. 23-467
Title:Benancio Garcia, III, Appellant
v.
Steven Hobbs, Secretary of State of Washington, et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2023
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Western District of Washington
   Case Numbers:(3:22-cv-05152-RSLDGE-LJCV)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 31 2023Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due December 4, 2023)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a motion to dismiss or affirm from December 4, 2023 to February 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 06 2023Response to motion to extend the time to file a motion to dismiss or affirm from appellant filed.
Main Document
Nov 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response to the jurisdictional statement is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 27, 2023, for all appellees.
Nov 09 2023Motion for leave to intervene filed by Susan Soto Palmer, Faviola Lopez, Alberto Macias, Heliodora Morfin, and Caty Padilla.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 14 2023Response to motion for leave to intervene from appellant filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 20 2023Reply to response to motion for leave to intervene of Susan Soto Palmer, Faviola Lopez, Alberto Macias, Heliodora Morfin, and Caty Padilla filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 21 2023Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 01 2023Correction to Appendix of Benancio Garcia, III submitted.
Main Document
Dec 11 2023Motion for leave to intervene filed by Susan Soto Palmer, et al. DENIED.
Dec 21 2023Brief amici curiae of Susan Soto Palmer, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2023Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellee Washington.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2023Brief opposing motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellant Benancio Garcia, III.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 28 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the jurisdictional statement pursuant to Rule 18.7 filed by appellant.
Main Document
Jan 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024.
Feb 09 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Feb 20 2024Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington with instructions to enter a fresh judgment from which an appeal may be taken to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellant
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky Josefiak PLLC
15405 John Marshall Hwy
Haymarket, VA 20169

JTORCHINSKY@HOLTZMANVOGEL.COM
540 341 8808
Party name: Benancio Garcia, III
Attorneys for Appellees
Noah Guzzo Purcell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street, SE
P.O. Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

noah.purcell@atg.wa.gov
360-753-6200
Party name: State of Washington
Cristina Marie Hwang SepeWashington State Office of the Attorney General
1125 Washington Street SE
Olympia, WA 98501

cristina.sepe@atg.wa.gov
360-753-7085
Party name: State of Washington
Karl David SmithWashington State Attorney General's Office
PO Box 40100
Olympia, WA 98504-0100

KARL.SMITH@ATG.WA.GOV
3607536200
Party name: Steven Hobbs
Other
Chad Wilson DunnUCLA Voting Rights Project
3250 Public Affairs Building
Los Angeles, CA 90095

chad@brazilanddunn.com
512-717-9822
Party name: Susan Soto Palmer, Faviola Lopez, Alberto Macias, Heliodora Morfin, Caty Padilla
Mark Peter Gaber
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

MGABER@CAMPAIGNLEGAL.ORG
202-736-2200
Party name: Susan Soto Palmer, Faviola Lopez, Alberto Macias, Heliodora Morfin, Caty Padilla