No. 23-466
Vide 23-477, 23-492
Title:L. W., By and Through Her Parents and Next Friends, Samantha Williams and Brian Williams, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jonathan Skrmetti, Attorney General and Reporter for Tennessee, et al.
Docketed:November 2, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(23-5600)
   Decision Date:September 28, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 01 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 4, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2023 to January 3, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 06 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 3, 2024.
Nov 17 2023Brief amici curiae of Foreign Non-Profit Organizations Advocating for the Rights of Transgender People filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 04 2023Brief amici curiae of American Academy of Pediatrics and Additional National and State Medical and Mental Health Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 04 2023Brief amici curiae of Elliot Page, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2024 to February 2, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 11 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 2, 2024.
Feb 02 2024Brief amicus curiae of Alabama filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2024Brief of respondents Jonathan Skrmetti, Attorney General and Reporter for Tennessee, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2024Reply of petitioners L. W., By and Through Her Parents and Next Friends, Samantha Williams and Brian Williams, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Chase Bachrach Strangio
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street
New York, NY 10004

cstrangio@aclu.org
2125492500
Party name: L. W., By and Through Her Parents and Next Friends, Samantha Williams and Brian Williams, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Cameron Thomas Norris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd., Ste 700
Arlington, VA 22209

cam@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Jonathan Skrmetti, et al.
Steven James GriffinTennessee Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

steven.griffin@ag.tn.gov
6157419598
Party name: Jonathan Skrmetti, et al.
Jeffrey Matthew HarrisConsovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

JEFF@CONSOVOYMCCARTHY.COM
(703) 243-9423
Party name: Jonathan Skrmetti, et al.
Other
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen and Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

cboccuzzi@cgsh.com
212-225-2508
Party name: Elliot Page, et al.
Andrew Rhys Davies
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

andrew.davies@wilmerhale.com
212 610 6300
Party name: Foreign Non-Profit Organizations Advocating for the Rights of Transgender People
Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Ave
Montgomery, AL 36130

EDMUND.LACOUR@ALABAMAAG.GOV
334-242-7300
Party name: State of Alabama
Debra Jean Veta
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

jveta@cov.com
202 662-5294
Party name: American Academy of Pediatrics and Additional National and State Medical and Mental Health Organizations