No. 23-450
Title:M. C., et vir, Petitioners
v.
Indiana Department of Child Services
Docketed:October 30, 2023
Linked with 23A32
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Indiana
   Case Numbers:(22A-JC-49)
   Decision Date:October 21, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:December 22, 2022
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 27, 2023

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2023Application (23A32) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 26, 2023 to September 24, 2023, submitted to Justice Barrett.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/Opinions
Jul 14 2023Application (23A32) granted by Justice Barrett extending the time to file until September 24, 2023.
Sep 25 2023Motion (23M30) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Sep 25 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 29, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2023MOTION (23M30) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023Motion (23M30) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
Nov 16 2023Waiver of right of respondent Indiana Department of Child Services to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Nov 29 2023Brief amicus curiae of Heritage Defense Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2023Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 29 2023Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Abigail Martinez.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 30 2023Response Requested. (Due January 2, 2024)
Dec 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2024 to February 1, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 1, 2024.
Feb 01 2024Brief of respondent Indiana Department of Child Services in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 15 2024Reply of petitioners M. C. and J. C. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joshua David Hershberger
    Counsel of Record
Hershberger Law Office
P.O. Box 233
Hanover, IN 47243

josh@hlo.legal
(812) 228-8783
Party name: M.C. and J.C.
Attorneys for Respondent
James Allen Barta
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
302 West Washington Street
IGC South, Fifth Floor
Indianapolis, IN 46204

james.barta@atg.in.gov
317-232-0709
Party name: Indiana Department of Child Services
Other
Bradley Wayne Pierce
    Counsel of Record
Heritage Defense Foundation
2082 US 183
Ste. 170 #224
Leander, TX 78641

bpierce@heritagedefense.org
(737) 305-7896
Party name: Heritage Defense Foundation
Kelly J. Shackelford
    Counsel of Record
First Liberty Institute
2001 W Piano Pkwy
Suite 1600
Plano, TX 75075

kshackelford@firstliberty.org
972-941-4444
Party name: Abigail Martinez
John Marc Wheat
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 930
Washington, DC 20004-2729

MWHEAT@ADVANCINGAMERICANFREEDOM.COM
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Inc.