No. 23-436
Vide 23-571
Title:Vikki E. Paulson, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:October 26, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55197, 21-55230)
   Decision Date:May 17, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:July 25, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 23 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2023Letter of Vikki E. Paulson , et al. submitted.
Main Document
Nov 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 27, 2023 to December 27, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 27, 2023.
Dec 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2023 to January 29, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 21 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 29, 2024.
Jan 29 2024Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 12 2024Reply of petitioners Vikki E. Paulson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Cyril Maloney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Traflet & Fabian
264 South Street
Morristown, NJ 07960

jmaloney@trafletfabian.com
(973) 631-6222
Party name: Vikki E. Paulson , et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States