No. 23-402
Title:Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:October 17, 2023
Linked with 23A34
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-5487)
   Decision Date:March 3, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:May 18, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2023Application (23A34) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 16, 2023 to October 15, 2023, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 18 2023Application (23A34) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until October 15, 2023.
Oct 13 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 16, 2023 to December 18, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 18, 2023.
Nov 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2023Brief amicus curiae of Scott Dilworth filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2023Brief amicus curiae of North American Association of Racetrack Veterinarians filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2023Brief amici curiae of Standardbred Owners Association of New York, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2023Brief amici curiae of Arkansas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 21 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2023 to January 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 22 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 17, 2024, for all respondents.
Jan 03 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2024 to February 16, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 05 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 16, 2024, for all respondents.
Feb 02 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2024 to March 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 05 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 18, 2024, for all respondents. See Rule 30.1.
Mar 04 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 18, 2024 to April 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 17, 2024, for all respondents.
Apr 01 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 17, 2024 to May 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 02 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 17, 2024, for all respondents.
May 17 2024Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 17 2024Brief of respondents Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 03 2024Reply of petitioners Oklahoma, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 04 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Matthew Dempsey McGill
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

MMCGILL@GIBSONDUNN.COM
(202) 955-8500
Party name: Hanover Shoe Farms, Inc. and United States Trotting Association
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

PSHAH@AKINGUMP.COM
202-887-4210
Party name: Horseracing Integrity and Safety Authority, Inc., Leonard S. Coleman, Jr., Nancy M. Cox, Steve Beshear, Adolpho A. Birch, Jr., Ellen McClain, Charles P. Scheeler, Joseph DeFrancis, Susan Stover, Bill Thomason, and D.G. Van Clief
Other
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

NICHOLAS.BRONNI@ARKANSASAG.GOV
501-682-6302
Party name: State of Arkansas, et al.
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
1628 N Main St. #289
Salinas, CA 93906

ATCASO@CCG1776.COM
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Peter John Sacopulos
    Counsel of Record
Sacopulos Law Firm
676 Ohio Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

pete_sacopulos@sacopulos.com
8122382565
Party name: Scott Dilworth
Peter John Sacopulos
    Counsel of Record
Sacopulos Law Firm
676 Ohio Street
Terre Haute, IN 47807

pete_sacopulos@sacopulos.com
8122382565
Party name: North American Association of Racetrack Veterinarians
Peter Joseph Venaglia
    Counsel of Record
Schaeffer Venaglia Handler & Fitzsimmons, LLP
1001 Avenue of the Americas, 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10018

venaglia@svhflaw.com
212-508-9319
Party name: Standardbred Owners Association of New York, and United States Representatives Lance Gooden, Clay Higgins, and Alexander Mooney