No. 23-377
Vide 23-514
Title:Chris Dutra, et al., Petitioners
v.
Kim Jackson
Docketed:October 11, 2023
Linked with 23A61
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-15622)
   Decision Date:February 17, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 19 2023Application (23A61) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 8, 2023 to October 6, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 25 2023Application (23A61) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 6, 2023.
Oct 06 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 13, 2023 to December 13, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 27 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2023.
Dec 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 13, 2023 to January 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 04 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 12, 2024.
Jan 04 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 12, 2024 to February 12, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 05 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 12, 2024.
Feb 12 2024Brief of respondent Kim Jackson in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 26 2024Reply of petitioners Chris Dutra, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jordan Tindle Smith
    Counsel of Record
Pisanelli Bice PLLC
400 South 7th Street Suite 300
Las Vegas, NV 89101

jts@pisanellibice.com
702-214-2100
Party name: Chris Dutra, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHUGHES@MWE.COM
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Kim Jackson