No. 23-373
Title:DeRay Mckesson, Petitioner
v.
John Doe
Docketed:October 10, 2023
Linked with 23A209
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30864)
   Decision Date:June 16, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 30 2023Application (23A209) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 14, 2023 to October 5, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Sep 06 2023Application (23A209) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 5, 2023.
Oct 05 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 9, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2023Brief amicus curiae of First Amendment Scholar John D. Inazu filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 08 2023Brief amicus curiae of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2023Brief amici curiae of Floyd Abrams, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2023Brief amicus curiae of Thurgood Marshall Civil Rights Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2023Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2023Waiver of right of respondent John Doe to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 29 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 04 2023Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2024)
Dec 15 2023Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2024Brief of respondent John Doe in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 17 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2024.
Jan 22 2024Reply of petitioner DeRay Mckesson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024.
Feb 26 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Thomas Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Donahue & Goldberg, LLP
240 Kent Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11249

david@donahuegoldberg.com
2123348813
Party name: DeRay Mckesson
Attorneys for Respondent
Donna Unkel Grodner
    Counsel of Record
Grodner & Associates
2223 Quail Run Drive
Suite B
Baton Rouge, LA 70808

dgrodner@grodnerlaw.com
2257691919
Party name: John Doe
Other
Erin Glenn Busby
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

EBUSBY@LAW.UTEXAS.EDU
7139660409
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Andrea Rose Butler
    Counsel of Record
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
211 North Broadway, Suite 3600
St. Louis, MO 63102

andrea.butler@bclplaw.com
314-259-2773
Party name: First Amendment Scholar John D. Inazu
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
700 Pennsylvania Ave. SE
Suite 340
Washington, DC 20003

bob.corn-revere@thefire.org
215-717-3743
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights and Expression
Justin David Hansford
    Counsel of Record
Howard University School of Law
2900 Van Ness St. NW
Washington, DC 20008

Justin.Hansford@law.howard.edu
2028068000
Party name: Thurgood Marshall Civil Rights Center
Hope R. Metcalf
    Counsel of Record
127 Wall Street
P.O. Box 209090
New Haven, CT 06520-9090

hope.metcalf@yale.edu
203-432-9404
Party name: NAACP
Meaghan Elizabeth McLaine VerGow
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mvergow@omm.com
(202)-383-5300
Party name: Floyd Abrams, Erwin Chemerinsky, Seth Kreimer, Robert Post, Amanda Shanor, Geoffrey R. Stone, Nadine Strossen, and Kenneth P. White