No. 23-370 | |
Title: | Paul Erlinger, Petitioner v. United States |
Docketed: | October 6, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (22-1926) |
Decision Date: | August 10, 2023 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Oct 04 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Oct 17 2023 | Brief for the United States filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Oct 23 2023 | Reply of petitioner Paul Erlinger filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 24 2023 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. |
Main Document | |
Oct 24 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023. |
Nov 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023. |
Nov 20 2023 | Petition GRANTED. |
Nov 21 2023 | D. Nick Harper, Esquire, of Washington, D. C., is invited to brief and argue this case, as amicus curiae, in support of the judgment below. |
Jan 03 2024 | Brief of petitioner Paul Erlinger filed. |
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 03 2024 | Brief of respondent United States in support of petitioner filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 03 2024 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Paul Erlinger. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 10 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of FAMM filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 10 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 10 2024 | Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 16 2024 | Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. |
Jan 29 2024 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, March 27, 2024. |
Jan 31 2024 | Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit. |
Feb 01 2024 | Record received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit and available with the Clerk. |
Feb 02 2024 | Brief of Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 05 2024 | Record received electronically from the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana and available with the Clerk. |
Feb 06 2024 | Motion for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Feb 14 2024 | CIRCULATED |
Feb 20 2024 | Motion for divided argument filed by the Solicitor General GRANTED. |
Mar 04 2024 | Reply of respondent United States filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Mar 04 2024 | Reply of petitioner Paul Erlinger filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Mar 27 2024 | Argued. For petitioner: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Menlo Park, Cal. For respondent supporting petitioner: Eric J. Feigin, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below: D. Nick Harper, Washington, D. C. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jeffrey L. Fisher Counsel of Record | O'Melveny & Myers LLP 2765 Sand Hill Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 JLFISHER@OMM.COM | (650) 473-2600 |
Party name: Paul Erlinger | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States | ||
Other | ||
Davina Te-min Chen Counsel of Record | Law Office of Davina T. Chen 1751 Colorado Blvd. No. 190 Los Angeles, CA 90041 Davina@DavinaChen.com | 2134468791 |
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders | ||
Denis Nicholas Harper | Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP 1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W. Washington, DC 20036 nharper@gibsondunn.com | (202) 955-8500 |
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below | ||
Nick Harper Counsel of Record | Gibson Dunn 1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W. Washington, DC 20036-5306 nharper@gibsondunn.com | 202-887-3534 |
Party name: Court-appointed amicus curiae in support of the judgment below | ||
Amy Mason Saharia Counsel of Record | Williams & Connolly LLP 680 Maine Avenue SW Washington, DC 20024 ASAHARIA@WC.COM | 202-434-5847 |
Party name: FAMM | ||
Peter Bert Siegal Counsel of Record | Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 799 9th Street NW, Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20001 peter.siegal@nortonrosefulbright.com | (202) 662-4663 |
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers |