No. 23-367
Title:Starbucks Corporation, Petitioner
v.
M. Kathleen McKinney, Regional Director of Region 15 of the National Labor Relations Board, for and on Behalf of the National Labor Relations Board
Docketed:October 5, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-5730)
   Decision Date:August 8, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 6, 2023 to December 6, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 16 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 6, 2023.
Nov 06 2023Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 06 2023Brief amici curiae of Coalition for a Democratic Workplace, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2023Brief of respondent M. Kathleen McKinney, Regional Director of Region 15 of the National Labor Relations Board, for and on Behalf of the National Labor Relations Board in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 20 2023Reply of petitioner Starbucks Corporation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 12 2024Petition GRANTED.
Feb 08 2024Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Starbucks Corporation.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 16 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 23, 2024.
Feb 20 2024Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 21 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit.
Feb 21 2024Brief of petitioner Starbucks Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 22 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Feb 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Coalition for a Democratic Workplace, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States and National Association of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Amicus brief of State of Tennessee and Twenty Other States submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2024Amicus brief of Buckeye Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: Starbucks Corporation
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Kathleen McKinney, Regional Director of Region 15 of the National Labor Relations Board, for and on Behalf of the National Labor Relations Board
Other
Markham Sterling ChenowethNew Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW
Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

mark.chenoweth@ncla.legal
2028695210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

GREGORY.GARRE@LW.COM
202-637-2207
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States and National Association of Manufacturers
Whitney Downs Hermandorfer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General & Reporte
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202-0207

whitney.hermandorfer@ag.tn.gov
615-741-7403
Party name: State of Tennessee and Twenty Other States
Sheng Tao Li
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW Suite 450
Washingtion, DC 20036

sheng.li@ncla.legal
3022498624
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

WLM@NRTW.ORG
7033218510
Party name: National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation
Stephanie Schuster
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

STEPHANIE.SCHUSTER@MORGANLEWIS.COM
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Coalition for a Democratic Workplace; Associated Builders and Contractors; HR Policy Association; National Association of Wholesaler-Distributors; and National Retail Federation
Stephanie Schuster
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20004

STEPHANIE.SCHUSTER@MORGANLEWIS.COM
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Coalition for a Democratic Workplace; Associated Builders and Contractors; HR Policy Association; National Retail Federation
David Christian Tryon
    Counsel of Record
The Buckeye Institute
88 East Broad Street
Columbus, OH 43215

d.tryon@buckeyeinstitute.org
6142244422
Party name: Buckeye Institute