No. 23-365
Title:Medical Marijuana, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Douglas J. Horn
Docketed:October 5, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-349-cv)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 06 2023Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 07 2023Waiver of right of respondent Douglas Horn, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 14 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Nov 16 2023Response Requested. (Due December 18, 2023)
Dec 01 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 18, 2023 to January 17, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 17, 2024.
Jan 09 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2024 to February 16, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 16 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 16, 2024.
Feb 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 16, 2024 to March 18, 2024, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 15 2024Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 18, 2024.
Mar 18 2024Brief of respondent Douglas Horn in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/19/2024.
Apr 03 2024Reply of petitioners Medical Marijuana, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 22 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2024.
Apr 29 2024Petition GRANTED.
May 07 2024Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 13 2024Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including July 9, 2024. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 28, 2024.
Jul 09 2024Brief of petitioners Medical Marijuana, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 11 2024Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2024Brief amicus curiae of U.S. Hemp Roundtable, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2024Brief amici curiae of DRI Center for Law & Public Policy and Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2024Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Product Liability Advisory Council, and American Tort Reform Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa S. Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: Medical Marijuana, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey Marc Benjamin
    Counsel of Record
The Linden Law Group, P.C.
250 Park Avenue, 7th Floor
New York, NY 10177

jbenjamin@nyfraudlaw.com
2126559536
Party name: Douglas Horn
Other
Donald Manwell Falk
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr Jaffe LLP
Four Embarcadero Center
Suite 1400
San Francisco, CA 94111

dfalk@schaerr-jaffe.com
650-269-2020
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Product Liability Advisory Council, and American Tort Reform Association
James Christopher Martin
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
225 Fifth Ave.
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

JCMARTIN@REEDSMITH.COM
4122883131
Party name: U.S. Hemp Roundtable, Inc.
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Sarah Elizabeth Spencer
    Counsel of Record
Spencer Willson PLLC
66 E. Exchange Place
Suite 208
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sarah@spencerwillsonpllc.com
8013468120
Party name: DRI Center for Law & Public Policy and Atlantic Legal Foundation
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation & DRI Center for Law and Public Policy