No. 23-334
Title:Department of State, et al., Petitioners
v.
Sandra Munoz, et al.
Docketed:September 29, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-55365)
   Decision Date:October 5, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:July 14, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 29 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2023)
Petition
Sep 29 2023Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Oct 17 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 30, 2023 to November 29, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Oct 18 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 29, 2023.
Nov 28 2023Brief of respondents Sandra Munoz, et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Dec 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Dec 13 2023Reply of petitioners Department of State, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Jan 08 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2024.
Jan 12 2024Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1 and 2 presented by the petition.
Jan 12 2024As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Feb 16 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 23, 2024.
Feb 20 2024Brief of petitioners Department of State, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 20 2024Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 21 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Feb 26 2024Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2024Brief of respondents Sandra Munoz, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2024CIRCULATED
Mar 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of HIAS Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2024Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of International Refugee Assistance Project, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of 35 Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of ACLU, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of The American Immigration Lawyers Association and The American Immigration Council filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Consular Officers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Migrant Rights Initiative, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Immigration Law and History Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Professors and Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of HEAL Refugee Health and Asylum Collaborative filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Former Department of Homeland Security Officials filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2024Brief amici curiae of Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 28 2024Brief amicus curiae of The American Bar Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 02 2024Record received electronically from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit and available with the Clerk.
Apr 12 2024Reply of petitioners Department of State, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 23 2024Argued. For petitioners: Curtis E. Gannon, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Eric T. Lee, Southfeld, Mich.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of State, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eric Thompson Lee
    Counsel of Record
Diamante Law Group
24225 W 9 Mile
Suite 140
Southfield, MI 48033

elee@diamantelaw.com
213-943-4555
Party name: Sandra Munoz, et al.
Charles G. RothNational Immigrant Justice Center
111 West Jackson Blvd., Suite 800
Chicago, IL 60604

croth@immigrantjustice.org
3126601613
Party name: Sandra Munoz, et al.
Keren Hart ZwickNational Immigrant Justice Center
111 W. Jackson Blvd., Suite 800
Chicago, IL 60604

kzwick@immigrantjustice.org
3126601364
Party name: Sandra Munoz, et al.
Other
Amer Shahid Ahmed
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166

aahmed@gibsondunn.com
(212) 351-2427
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops and Catholic Legal Immigration Network, Inc.
Nadia Anguiano
    Counsel of Record
Federal Immigration Litigation Clinic
James H. Binger Center for New Americans, University of Minnesota Law School
229 19th Ave. S.
Minneapolis, MN 55455

angui010@umn.edu
(612) 301-8653
Party name: Professors and Scholars
Noah Butsch BaronAsian Americans Advancing Justice-AAJC
1620 L Street NW
Suite 1050
Washington, DC 200036

nbaron@advancingjustice-aajc.org
6098021874
Party name: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Asian Americans Advancing Justice AAJC, et. al.
Lauren Elizabeth Bateman
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

lbateman@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Daniel Antonio Galindo
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

dgalindo@aclu.org
6468420933
Party name: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, ACLU OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, ACLU OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA, AND ACLU OF SAN DIEGO AND IMPERIAL COUNTIES
Jeffrey Scott Ginsberg
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

jginsberg@pbwt.com
212-336-2000
Party name: Former Department of Homeland Security Officials
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

CHAJEC@IRLI.ORG
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Melissa S. Keaney
    Counsel of Record
International Refugee Assistance Project
One Battery Park Plaza, 33rd Floor
New York, NY 10004

mkeaney@refugeerights.org
9165466125
Party name: International Refugee Assistance Project
Ian Matthew Kysel
    Counsel of Record
Cornell Law School Transnational Disputes Clinic
Cornell Law School
159 Hughes Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

Ian.kysel@cornell.edu
6072555503
Party name: MIGRANT RIGHTS INITIATIVE AND IMMIGRATION, INTERNATIONAL, AND COMPARATIVE LAW SCHOLARS
Erin Marie Meyer
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
250 Greenwich Street
New York, NY 10007

erin.meyer@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: 35 Members of Congress
Matthew Eben Price
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MPRICE@JENNER.COM
202-639-6873
Party name: Former Consular Officers
Deanna Marie Rice
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
1625 Eye Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

derice@omm.com
202-383-5300
Party name: Immigration Law and History Scholars
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The American Immigration Lawyers Association and The American Immigration Council
Benjamin Gross Shatz
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps, & Phillips, LLP
2049 Century Park East
Suite 1700
Los Angles, CA 90067-3119

bshatz@manatt.com
3103124383
Party name: HIAS Inc.
Mary L. Smith
    Counsel of Record
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

AmicusBriefs@americanbar.org
312-988-5000
Party name: The American Bar Association
Corey Lynn Stoughton
    Counsel of Record
Selendy Gay PLLC
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104

cstoughton@selendygay.com
2123909000
Party name: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Asian Americans Advancing Justice AAJC, et. al.
David Meir Zionts
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burlington LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

dzionts@cov.com
(202) 662-5987
Party name: HEAL Refugee Health and Asylum Collaborative