No. 23-323 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Joseph Gamboa, Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:September 28, 2023
Linked with 23A38
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-70023)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:April 25, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 13 2023Application (23A38) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 24, 2023 to September 22, 2023, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 18 2023Application (23A38) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 22, 2023.
Sep 22 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 30, 2023 to November 29, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 17 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 29, 2023.
Oct 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Former Federal and State Prosecutors filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Oct 30 2023Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Habeas Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2023 to December 20, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 20 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 20, 2023.
Dec 20 2023Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division, in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2023Reply of petitioner Joseph Gamboa filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2024.
Jan 16 2024Record Requested.
Jan 16 2024Record received from the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. The record is available on PACER.
Feb 05 2024Electronic record received from the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas.
Feb 07 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2024.
Feb 21 2024Rescheduled.
Feb 26 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2024.
Feb 29 2024Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Timothy Tutt
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer
601 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

ANDREW.TUTT@ARNOLDPORTER.COM
202-942-5000
Party name: Joseph Gamboa
Attorneys for Respondent
Ali Mustapha Nasser
    Counsel of Record
Texas Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711

ali.nasser@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1400
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin
Other
Deborah Delores Enix-Ross
    Counsel of Record
American Bar Association
321 N. Clark St.
Chicago , IL 60654

AMICUSBRIEFS@AMERICANBAR.ORG
312-988-5000
Party name: American Bar Association
James Patrick Gagen
    Counsel of Record
Allen & Overy LLP
1101 New York Avenue
Washington, DC 20005

james.gagen@allenovery.com
202-683-3896
Party name: Habeas Scholars
Marc Morris SeltzerSusman Godfrey L.L.P.
1900 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1400
Los Angeles, CA 90067

mseltzer@susmangodfrey.com
310-789-3100
Party name: Former Federal and State Prosecutors