No. 23-32
Vide 23-94
Title:Edward Jacob Lang, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 11, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-3039)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:May 23, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 07 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 10, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 17 2023Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 19 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Jul 31 2023Response Requested. (Due August 30, 2023)
Aug 24 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 30, 2023 to September 29, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 28 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 29, 2023.
Aug 30 2023Brief amici curiae of Christopher Warnagiris, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 25 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 29, 2023 to October 30, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 26 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 30, 2023.
Oct 27 2023Motion of FormerFedsGroup Freedom Foundation 501c3 for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (December 07, 2023)
Oct 27 2023Amicus brief of FormerFedsGroup Freedom Foundation 501c3 not accepted for filing. (December 07, 2023)
Oct 30 2023Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 14 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Norman A. Pattis
    Counsel of Record
Pattis & Smith, LLC
383 Orange St., First Floor
New Haven, CT 06511

npattis@pattislaw.com
(203) 393-3017
Party name: Edward Lang
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Theodore Mark Cooperstein
    Counsel of Record
Theodore Cooperstein PLLC
1888 Main Street
Suite C-203
Madison, MS 39110

ted@appealslawyer.us
6013972471
Party name: Christopher Warnagiris, Christopher Carnell, William Robert Norwood
Thomas Brindley Renz
    Counsel of Record
Renz Law
1907 W State Street #162
Fremont, OH 43420

renzlawllc@gmail.com
4192808079
Party name: FormerFedsGroup Freedom Foundation 501c3