No. 23-3
Title:Coinbase, Inc., Petitioner
v.
David Suski, et al.
Docketed:June 30, 2023
Linked with 22A989
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(22-15209)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:February 23, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2023Application (22A989) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 24, 2023 to June 23, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
May 12 2023Application (22A989) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until June 23, 2023.
Jun 23 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 13 2023Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed. (Brief withdrawn by letter dated July 17, 2023)
Jul 17 2023Letter dated July 17, 2023 from cousel for amicus curiae Anthony Michael Sabino filed withdrawing amicus curiae brief.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 28 2023Waiver of right of respondent David Suski, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 02 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/26/2023.
Aug 23 2023Response Requested. (Due September 22, 2023)
Sep 22 2023Brief of respondents David Suski, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2023Reply of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 30 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2023.
Nov 03 2023Petition GRANTED.
Dec 12 2023Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Dec 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits denied
Dec 18 2023Brief of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2023Joint appendix (Volumes I and II) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Dec 20 2023Brief amicus curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2023Brief amicus curiae of Anthony Michael Sabino filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2023Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Bankers Association, Cato Institute, American Tort Reform Association, and the Business Council of New York State filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 04 2024Motion for an extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jan 05 2024SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, February 28, 2024.
Jan 08 2024Motion to extend the time to file respondents' brief on the merits is granted and the time is extended to and including January 22, 2024.
Jan 10 2024Record requested from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.
Jan 11 2024CIRCULATED.
Jan 22 2024Brief of David Suski, et al. not accepted for filing. (January 22, 2024--Incorrect version printed and electronically submitted.)
Jan 22 2024Brief of respondents David Suski, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 23 2024Record received from the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The record is electronic and is available on PACER.
Jan 29 2024Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2024Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.(Feb. 6, 2024) (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2024Reply of petitioner Coinbase, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

JESSICA.ELLSWORTH@HOGANLOVELLS.COM
202-637-5886
Party name: Coinbase, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
David John Harris Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Harris LLP
501 West Broadway
Suite 800
San Diego, CA 92101

david@harrisllp.com
(619) 213-1102
Party name: David Suski, et al.
Other
Glenn Edward Chappell
    Counsel of Record
Tycko & Zavareei LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Suite 1010
Washington, DC 20006

GCHAPPELL@TZLEGAL.COM
(202) 973-0900
Party name: Legal Scholars
Lawrence S. Ebner
    Counsel of Record
Atlantic Legal Foundation
1701 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

lawrence.ebner@atlanticlegal.org
202-729-6337
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

SNELSON@CITIZEN.ORG
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Robert S. Peck
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Litigation, PC
1901 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 1008
Washington, DC 20009

ROBERT.PECK@CCLFIRM.COM
2029442874
Party name: American Association for Justice
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

APINCUS@MAYERBROWN.COM
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, American Bankers Association, Cato Institute, American Tort Reform Association, and the Business Council of New York State
Anthony Michael Sabino
    Counsel of Record
Sabino & Sabino, P.C.
92 Willis Avenue, 2nd Floor
Mineola, NY 11501

ANTHONY.SABINO@SABINOLAW.COM
516-294-3199
Party name: Anthony Michael Sabino