No. 23-267
Title:Marilyn Williams, Petitioner
v.
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 20, 2023
Linked with 23A79
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-10306)
   Decision Date:November 7, 2022
   Rehearing Denied:May 18, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 25 2023Application (23A79) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 16, 2023 to October 15, 2023, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jul 27 2023Application (23A79) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 15, 2023.
Sep 15 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 20, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 16 2023Waiver of right of respondents Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corp. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023.
Nov 06 2023Response Requested. (Due December 6, 2023)
Nov 13 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 6, 2023 to December 22, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 14 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 22, 2023.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ashley Conrad Keller
    Counsel of Record
Keller Postman LLC
150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 4100
Chicago, IL 60606

ACK@KELLERPOSTMAN.COM
3127415222
Party name: Marilyn Williams
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Alessio Mezzina
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

pmezzina@kslaw.com
202-626-8988
Party name: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corp.