No. 23-250 Vide 23-253 | |
Title: | Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al., Petitioners v. San Carlos Apache Tribe |
Docketed: | September 15, 2023 |
Linked with 23A103 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-15641) |
Decision Date: | November 21, 2022 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 16, 2023 |
Questions Presented |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Aug 03 2023 | Application (23A103) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 14, 2023 to September 13, 2023, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Aug 04 2023 | Application (23A103) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 13, 2023. |
Sep 13 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2023) |
PetitionProof of Service | |
Oct 11 2023 | Response to petition from respondent San Carlos Apache Tribe filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Oct 20 2023 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioners. |
Main Document | |
Oct 24 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2023. |
Oct 24 2023 | Reply of petitioners Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count | |
Nov 13 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/17/2023. |
Nov 20 2023 | Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 23-253 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. |
Nov 20 2023 | Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 23-250. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 23-250. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.” |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Elizabeth B. Prelogar Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: Xavier Becerra, Secretary of Health and Human Services, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Lloyd Benton Miller Counsel of Record | Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry LLP 1425 K Street, NW Washington, DC 20005 Lloyd@sonosky.net | (202) 682-0240 |
Party name: San Carlos Apache Tribe | ||
Carter G. Phillips | Sidley Austin LLP Sidley Austin LLP 1501 K Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20005 CPHILLIPS@SIDLEY.COM | +1 202 736 8270 |
Party name: San Carlos Apache Tribe |