No. 23-248 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James Garfield Broadnax, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:September 14, 2023
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-81,573-02)
   Decision Date:June 7, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2023)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 21 2023Letter dated September 21, 2023, from counsel for petitioner with clarification of a factual statement filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 02 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 16, 2023 to November 3, 2023, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2023Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 3, 2023.
Oct 16 2023Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2023Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 17 2023Reply of petitioner James Garfield Broadnax filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 21 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 04 2023Record Requested.
Dec 05 2023Electronic record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas.
Dec 13 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024.
Jan 02 2024Rescheduled.
Feb 02 2024Supplemental brief of petitioner James Garfield Broadnax filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 23 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2024.
May 08 2024Rescheduled.
May 13 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2024.
May 14 2024Rescheduled.
May 20 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2024.
May 22 2024Rescheduled.
May 28 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2024.
May 28 2024Rescheduled.
Jun 03 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024.
Jun 10 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/13/2024.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Steven Craig Herzog
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

sherzog@paulweiss.com
(212) 373-3000
Party name: James Garfield Broadnax
Attorneys for Respondent
Michele O'Brien Yeatts
    Counsel of Record
Dallas County District Attorney
133 North Riverfront Blvd., LB-19
Dallas, TX 75207-4399

SYEATTS@DALLASCOUNTY.ORG
214-653-3630
Party name: Texas
Other
Michaele N Turnage Young
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
700 14th Street NW, 6th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

MTURNAGEYOUNG@NAACPLDF.ORG
(202) 216-5567
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.