No. 23-237 | |
Title: | Winfred Wairimu Wamai, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Adam Titus Wamai, et al., Petitioners v. Industrial Bank of Korea |
Docketed: | September 12, 2023 |
Linked with 22A1041 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (21-1956) |
Decision Date: | March 8, 2023 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 12, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 30 2023 | Application (22A1041) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 11, 2023 to September 8, 2023, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jun 01 2023 | Application (22A1041) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 8, 2023. |
Sep 08 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2023) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 26 2023 | Waiver of right of respondent Industrial Bank of Korea to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Sep 27 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2023. |
Oct 10 2023 | Response Requested. (Due November 9, 2023) |
Oct 11 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 9, 2023 to December 11, 2023, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Oct 12 2023 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 11, 2023. |
Nov 09 2023 | Brief amicus curiae of American Foreign Service Association filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 11 2023 | Brief of respondent Industrial Bank of Korea in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 14 2023 | Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner. |
Main Document | |
Dec 20 2023 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2024. |
Dec 20 2023 | Reply of petitioners Wamai, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 08 2024 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Steven Robert Perles Counsel of Record | Perles Law Firm, PC 816 Connecticut Avenue Northwest 12th Floor Washington, DC 20006 sperles@perleslaw.com | 2029559055 |
Party name: Wamai, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Joseph Russell Palmore Counsel of Record | Morrison & Foerster LLP 2100 L Street, NW Suite 900 Washington, DC 20037 JPALMORE@MOFO.COM | 202-887-6940 |
Party name: Industrial Bank of Korea | ||
Other | ||
Tejinder Singh Counsel of Record | Sparacino PLLC 1920 L Street, NW Suite 835 Washington, DC 20036 TEJINDER@SPARACINOPLLC.COM | (202) 629-3530 |
Party name: American Foreign Service Association |