No. 23-236 Vide 23-235 | |
Title: | Danco Laboratories, L.L.C., Petitioner v. Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, et al. |
Docketed: | September 12, 2023 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (23-10362) |
Decision Date: | August 16, 2023 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Sep 08 2023 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2023) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Sep 27 2023 | Motion of Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, et al. for an extension of time submitted. |
Main Document |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth Counsel of Record | Hogan Lovells US LLP 555 13th Street, N. W. Washington, DC 20004 JESSICA.ELLSWORTH@HOGANLOVELLS.COM | 202-637-5886 |
Party name: Danco Laboratories, L.L.C. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
John J. Bursch Counsel of Record | Alliance Defending Freedom 440 First Street, NW Suite 600 Washington, DC 20001 jbursch@adflegal.org | (616) 450-4235 |
Party name: Alliance for Hippocratic Medicine, et al. |