No. 23-217
Title:E.M.D. Sales, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Faustino Sanchez Carrera, et al.
Docketed:September 8, 2023
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-1897, 21-1924)
   Decision Date:July 27, 2023
   Rehearing Denied:August 22, 2023
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2023Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2023)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2023Waiver of right of respondent Faustino Sanchez Carrera, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 06 2023Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 10 2023Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2023.
Oct 12 2023Response Requested. (Due November 13, 2023)
Nov 07 2023Brief of respondents Faustino Sanchez Carrera, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2023Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for the distribution of the petition pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Nov 13 2023Reply of petitioners E.M.D. Sales, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 14 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2023.
Dec 01 2023Rescheduled.
Dec 01 2023DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2023.
Dec 11 2023The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 07 2024Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 20 2024Supplemental brief of respondents Faustino Sanchez Carrera, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 21 2024DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2024.
May 21 2024Supplemental brief of petitioners E.M.D. Sales, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Lisa S. Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
680 Maine Avenue SW
Washington, DC 20024

LBLATT@WC.COM
202-434-5050
Party name: E.M.D. Sales, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Lauren Elizabeth Bateman
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen
1600 20th Street NW
Washington, DC 20009

lbateman@citizen.org
202-588-7739
Party name: Faustino Sanchez Carrera, et al.
Omar Vincent MelehyMelehy & Associates LLC
8403 Colesville Road, Suite #610
Silver Spring, MD 20910

ovmelehy@melehylaw.com
301-587-6364
Party name: Faustino Sanchez Carrera, et al.
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SUPREMECTBRIEFS@USDOJ.GOV
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
John Mercer Masslon III
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

JMASSLON@WLF.ORG
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Inc., National Retail Federation, and Restaurant Law Center